IL HB4249 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Long Term Care Ombudsman Program, expands the definition of "access" to means the right to inspect and copy the clinical and other records of a participant or resident, regardless of age, with the express written consent of the participant or resident, or if consent is given orally, visually, or through the use of auxiliary aids and services, such consent is documented contemporaneously by a representative of the Office of State Long Term Care Ombudsman. In provisions requiring long term care facilities, supportive living facilities, assisted living establishments, and shared housing establishments to permit Office representatives to examine and copy a resident's clinical and other reports, includes reports of incidents or occurrences involving the resident that were made to other State agencies.
Title
AGING-LONG TERM OMBUDSMAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |