IL HB4275 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of organized retail theft. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she does any of the following: (1) acts in concert with one or more persons to steal merchandise from one or more merchant's premises with the intent to deprive the merchant permanently of the possession, use or benefit of the merchandise without paying the full retail value of the merchandise or to sell, exchange, or return the merchandise for value; (2) acts in concert with 2 or more persons to receive, purchase, or possess merchandise described in item (1), knowing or believing it to have been stolen; (3) acts as an agent of another individual or group of individuals to steal merchandise from one or more merchant's premises as part of an organized plan to commit theft; or (4) recruits, coordinates, organizes, supervises, directs, manages, or finances another to undertake any of the acts described in item (1) or (2) or any other statute defining theft of merchandise. Provides penalties and establishes venue for organized retail theft.
Title
CRIM CD-ORGANIZED RETAIL THEFT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-01-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-12-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-12-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-12-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-12-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-12-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-12-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-12-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 16-29.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4275&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4275.htm |