IL HB4327 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that, during any investigation of alleged child abuse or neglect that does not result in a placement of the child outside of the child's home, the Department of Children and Family Services shall provide information to the parent or guardian about community service programs that provide respite care, voluntary guardianship, or other support services for families in crisis. Amends the Illinois Power of Attorney Act. Provides that a parent or legal custodian of a child may execute a power of attorney delegating to another person, for a period not to exceed one year (or a longer period in the case of a servicemember), certain powers regarding the care and custody of the child. Contains provisions regarding: the legal effects of the power of attorney; the form of the power of attorney; other laws; and other matters.
Title
POWER OF ATTY-CHILD CUSTODY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0599 |
2016-07-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 45 | 1A-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 45 | 1A-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 45 | 1A-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 45 | 1A-4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 45 | Art. I-A heading | New Code | See Bill Text |