IL HB4333 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-10 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004 | |
2009-03-10 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-03-03 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4333&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4333.htm |