IL HB4333 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes changes in provisions concerning fidelity, surety, property, and casualty insurance. Modifies requirements concerning workers' compensation to include State officers, boards, commissions, and universities (currently, only State agencies). Specifies that indemnification expenses on final settlements or final judgments for employees of the Department of Transportation, the Illinois State Police, and the Secretary of State, which result from the Road Fund portion of their normal operations, shall be paid from the Road Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes concerning the Workers' Compensation Revolving Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
CMS-WORKERS COMP-INDEMNITY
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0767 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-017-003 |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-004-000 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 64.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |