IL HB4340 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Human Trafficking Resource Center Notice Act. To the list of entities required to post the notice under the Act, adds: massage parlors and bath houses; public gatherings and special events conducted on property open to the public that require the issuance of a permit from the unit of local government; establishments used primarily for gaming and where gaming equipment or supplies are used or offered for use for the purpose of accruing business revenue; and public and private elementary and secondary schools. Provides that the Department of Revenue or the governmental entity regulating a business or establishment (instead of the Department of Labor) shall monitor and enforce compliance with the Act.
Title
TRAFFICKING RESOURCE NOTICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0671 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 50 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 50 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |