IL HB4352 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that in an administrative hearing in which the owner of a vehicle may contest the merits of an alleged automated traffic law violation, the violation must be proven beyond a reasonable doubt and the formal or technical rules of evidence that apply in court proceedings on moving traffic violations apply in the administrative hearing.
Title
VEH CD-REDLIGHT CAMERA BURDEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4352&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4352.htm |