IL HB4391 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not impose a tax, fee, or other assessment other than a retailers' occupation tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition. Provides that the provisions of any ordinance or resolution, in effect or adopted, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act by any unit of local government, including a home rule unit, that imposes a tax, fee, or other assessment other a retailers' occupation tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition are invalid and void. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-LOCAL REG
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] |
Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4391&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4391.htm |