IL HB4394 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on December 23, 1993 by the City of Lacon. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD TIF-LACON
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2016-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |