IL HB4407 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Expands the definition of "sex offense" to include involuntary sexual servitude of a minor and attempted involuntary sexual servitude of a minor when committed on or after January 1, 2023.
Title
INVOLUNTARY SEXUAL SERVITUDE
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Bos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4407&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4407.htm |