IL HB4410 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Increases certain penalties that the Department of Agriculture shall impose upon a person or entity who violates any provision of the Act or rule adopted under the Act. Provides that an administrative fine of $500 (rather than $200) shall be imposed for the first violation; a fine of $1,000 (rather than $500) shall be imposed for a second violation that occurs within 3 years after the first violation; and that mandatory probationary status and a fine of $2,500 (rather than mandatory probationary status and a fine of $1,000) shall be imposed for a third violation that occurs within 3 years after the first violation. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE ACT-ADMIN FINES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0855 |
2014-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2014 |
2014-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-006-000 |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |