IL HB4413 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that for purposes of the Act, "addicted to narcotics" does not include possession or use of cannabis that is lawful under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act regardless of federal law or federal guidelines.
Title
FOID CARD-MEDICAL CANNABIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4413&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4413.htm |