IL HB4448 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Solid Waste Planning and Recycling Act. Provides that, beginning 18 months after the amendatory Act's effective date, (1) no store or food service business shall provide or sell a single-use plastic carryout bag to a customer and (2) no grocery store shall provide or sell a single-use paper carryout bag to a customer. Preempts home rule. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
PLASTIC BAG REDUCTION
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-07-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-07-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4448&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4448.htm |