IL HB4452 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions; the expiration and renewal of a managing broker, broker, or residential leasing agent license; continuing education requirements; sponsoring brokers; agency relationship disclosure; dual agency; grounds for discipline; citations; licensing of education providers; approval of courses; and the Real Estate Administration and Disciplinary Board. Provides that on January 1, 2021, or as soon thereafter as practical, the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer the remaining balance from the Real Estate Audit Fund into the Real Estate License Administration Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to repeal provisions creating the Real Estate Audit Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury. Repeals the Real Estate Regulation Transfer Act. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ESTATE LICENSE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-001 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 454 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 15-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 25-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 25-21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 25-38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 454 | 30-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 30-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 456 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4452&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4452.htm |