IL HB4472 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that each clerk of the circuit court must report to the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts every 30 days the following: (1) the number of persons who were released on bond within the circuit; (2) for each bonded offense, the name of the judge who issued the bond; and (3) the offense for which bond was set, the amount of bond, and if the person admitted to bail was released on electronic monitoring. Provides that the information described in this provision is a public record and is disclosable under the Freedom of Information Act from the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts. Provides that the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts shall determine the manner in which the information is reported to the Office from the clerks of courts. Effective immediately.
Title
CLERKS OF COURTS-REPORT-AOIC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4472&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4472.htm |