IL HB4476 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that each State building constructed, acquired, or of which more than 50% of the façade is substantially altered shall meet specified standards concerning bird safety. Provides requirements for the Director of Central Management Services in implementing the standards. Specifies that the provisions shall not apply to any acquisition or substantial alteration if the Director, after consideration of multiple options, determines that the use of the required building materials and design features would result in a significant additional cost for the project. Exempts specified buildings from the requirements.
Title
CMS-BIRD SAFE STATE BUILDINGS
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |