IL HB4481 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that court security officers are exempt from provisions barring the carrying and possession of weapons in a vehicle, concealed upon one's person, or upon public streets, alleys, or other public lands within the corporate limits of a municipality. Amends the County Jail Act. Provides that court security officers shall be deemed to be qualified law enforcement officers or, if retired, shall be deemed qualified retired or separated law enforcement officers in Illinois for purposes of coverage under the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2004 and shall have all rights and privileges granted by that Act if the court security officer or retired court security officer is otherwise compliant with the applicable laws of this State governing the implementation and administration of the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2004 in the State of Illinois.
Title
COURT SECURITY OFFICER-WEAPONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 125 | 26.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4481&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4481.htm |