IL HB4490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, home rule municipalities and non-home rule municipalities may not impose any tax increase or levy any new or additional tax without prior referendum approval. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNICIPAL REVENUE REFERENDUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4490&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4490.htm |