IL HB4490 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Removes language providing that a person who has been convicted of a felony is not qualified to act as an executor or an administrator.
Title
PROBATE-EXECUTOR-FELONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-01-27 | House | To Commercial & Property Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 6-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 9-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4490&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4490.htm |