IL HB4502 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public-Private Partnerships for Transportation Act. Defines "design-build agreement" and "shortlist". Provides that the net proceeds, if any, arising out of a transportation project or public-private agreement undertaken by the Department of Transportation under the Act shall be deposited into the Road (instead of the State Construction Account) Fund. Removes language providing that the Toll Highway Authority shall not enter into a public-private agreement for the purpose of making roadway improvements. Provides hearing requirements to address potential projects submitted to the General Assembly under the Act. Makes other changes in the Section concerning formation of public-private agreements and project planning. Replaces provisions concerning the selection of design work contractors and procurement procedure provisions for public agencies. Replaces prequalification provisions with provisions concerning shortlisting. Re-letters the subsections of a Section concerning procurement process and makes other changes to that Section. Makes changes in a Section concerning design-build procurement. Replaces "construction" with "development" and adds design-build-finance agreements to the list of acceptable forms of agreement. Removes language making a transportation agency taking over a project subject to liens on revenues which had been previously granted by the contractor. Provides that public and private entities shall have an equal opportunity to contract with the Authority. Makes a change in the Section concerning financial arrangements. Provides that a public-private agreement may not exceed 65 (instead of 99) years. Effective immediately.
Title
TRANS:PUB-PRIVATE PARTNERSHIPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
630 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
630 | 5 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4502&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4502.htm |