IL HB4526 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in the amount of $5,000 for a taxpayer who is a qualified community care physician. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-COMMUNITY CARE
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Brandun Schweizer [R] | Rep. Patrick Sheehan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4526&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4526.htm |