IL HB4570 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that a licensed cosmetology teacher who submits to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation an application for licensure as a barber teacher must meet all requirements of the Act for licensure as a barber teacher, except that an applicant who has at least 3 years of experience as a licensed cosmetology teacher shall be given credit for hours of instruction completed for his or her cosmetology teacher license in subjects that are common to both barbering and cosmetology in the supplemental barber course. Provides that a licensed barber teacher who submits to the Department an application for licensure as a cosmetology teacher must meet all requirements of the Act for licensure as a cosmetology teacher, except that an applicant who has at least 3 years of experience as a licensed barber teacher shall be given credit for hours of instruction completed for his or her barber teacher license in subjects that are common to both barbering and cosmetology in the supplemental cosmetology course. Provides that a licensed esthetician teacher or licensed nail technician teacher who submits to the Department an application for licensure as a cosmetology teacher must meet all requirements of the Act for licensure as a cosmetology teacher, except that an applicant who has at least 3 years of experience as an esthetician teacher or licensed nail technician teacher shall be given credit for hours of instruction completed for his or her esthetician teacher or nail technician teacher license in subjects that are common to both esthetics or nail technology and cosmetology. Provides that the Department shall provide for the implementation of these provisions by rule.
Title
COSMETOLOGY/BARBER TEACHER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0675 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 410 | 2-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 410 | 3-11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 410 | 3-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |