IL HB4608 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning the Department of Human Services' child care assistance program, provides that, to ensure families have access to child care during periods of unemployment, the Department shall provide child care services for 12 weeks a year to parents or other relatives as defined by rule who, at the time of application, are otherwise eligible for child care assistance but are not employed and are not participating in Department-approved education or training programs. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-UNEMPLOYED PARENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2020-02-06 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2020-02-05 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-05 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4608&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4608.htm |