IL HB4699 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Water Supply Operations Act. Provides that every community water supply in Illinois, with specified exemptions, shall have on its operational staff, and shall designate to the Agency in writing, either (i) one Responsible Operator in Charge who directly supervises both the treatment and distribution facilities of the community water supply or (ii) one Responsible Operator in Charge who directly supervises the treatment facilities of the community water supply and one Responsible Operator in Charge who directly supervises the distribution facilities of the community water supply. Defines "Responsible Operator in Charge". Establishes duties of Responsible Operators in Charge. Provides that a violation of the Act by a Responsible Operators in Charge shall be enforceable by administrative citation. Changes certain references from "natural person" and "person" to "individual". Defines "official custodian" and "person". Provides that the Agency may investigate violations of the Act or any rule adopted under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB WATER SUPPLY OPERATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 45 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 1.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 23.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 9.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 9.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4699&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4699.htm |