IL HB4715 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0898
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0898
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Fire Protection District Act. In provisions concerning physical ability examinations, provides that the tests utilized to measure each applicant's capabilities may be tests based on industry standards currently in use or equivalent tests approved by the Joint Labor-Management Committee of the Office of the State Fire Marshal. Provides that a passing score on the written examination is one that is at or above the median (now, mean) score for all applicants. Sets forth requirements concerning preference points and placement on the final eligibility register. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
EXAM OF FIREFIGHTER APPLICANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0898 |
2012-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2012 |
2012-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Re-assigned to Local Government |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |