IL HB4749 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Patient Rights Act. Provides that it is the policy of this State that managed care companies or third-party payers shall not mandate that health care professionals use a specific electronic medical records software system in order to provide or bill for services to patients. Prohibits specified insurance policies, plans, or arrangements for the purchase of health care, payment for health care, or reimbursement for health care, or an agency of the State or of any municipality, county, district, or other political subdivision of the State, from discriminating with respect to the provision of, or contracts for, health care or related services against a health care professional on the basis of that health care professional's utilization of a specific electronic medical records software system.
Title
PATIENT RIGHTS-RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4749&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4749.htm |