IL HB4773 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Department of Children and Family Services' Statewide Youth Advisory Board Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to convene and maintain a Statewide Youth Advisory Board and regional youth advisory boards. Provides that each regional youth advisory board shall work with the Department or its designee to determine how to best provide services to current and former youth in foster care living within each of the regions; and that the Statewide Youth Advisory Board shall advise the Department and the General Assembly with respect to all matters involving or affecting current and former youth in foster care. Sets forth the responsibilities of the Statewide Youth Advisory Board. Contains provisions concerning membership, meetings, operations, and reporting requirements. Provides that meetings of the Statewide Youth Advisory Board and the regional youth advisory boards shall be closed to the public and shall not be subject to the Open Meetings Act. Provides that records and information provided to and maintained by the Statewide Youth Advisory Board and the regional youth advisory boards shall be confidential and not subject to the Freedom of Information Act. Amends the Open Meetings Act and the Freedom of Information Act to exclude the Statewide Youth Advisory Board and the regional youth advisory boards from the definition of "public body".
Title
DCFS YOUTH ADVISORY BOARD ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0806 |
2014-08-01 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-001-000 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-008-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-04-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |