IL HB4836 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-08 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-08 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sunshine Commission Act. Provides for the appointment by the legislative leaders of a Sunshine Commission, consisting of 4 legislators and 4 public members, to conduct a thorough review of the relevance, efficiency, and effectiveness of each "State executive branch program". Requires the Commission to report its recommendations to the General Assembly within 6 months after the Act's effective date. Requires the General Assembly, by joint resolution, to approve or reject the report within 60 session days after the report is filed. Repeals the Act 2 years after its effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
SUNSHINE COMMISSION ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-02 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 91 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 91 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-08 | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto | |
2010-12-02 | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Lost 024-023-000 | |
2010-12-02 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-12-02 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ronald Sandack | |
2010-11-30 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2010-11-23 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-16 | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 091-022-000 | |
2010-11-16 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-10 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. David Reis | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2010 | |
2010-07-23 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2010-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2010-03-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |