IL HB4866 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that beginning in State Fiscal Year 2021, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, the Department of Children and Family Services shall implement the rate reimbursement methodology outlined in a specified provision of the Illinois Administrative Code when calculating and determining the payment rates for private agencies that contract with the Department to provide any specified services, including, but not limited to: (i) residential services; (ii) specialized, adolescent, treatment, or other non-traditional or Home-of-Relative foster care services; and (iii) intact family services. Provides that the payment rates calculated and determined, as provided in the amendatory Act, shall include an amount equal to any increase in the general inflation as determined by the consumer price index and shall be subject to appropriations. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-PAYMENT RATE INCREASES
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4866&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4866.htm |