IL HB4866 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education shall establish and administer a program to award property tax relief grants to school districts in this State. Provides that, in exchange for receiving a grant, a school district's maximum aggregate property tax extension for the taxable year that begins on January 1 of the fiscal year for which the grant is awarded may not exceed an adjusted maximum aggregate property tax extension for that taxable year. Creates the Education Property Tax Relief Fund as a special fund in the State treasury for the purpose of awarding grants. Sets forth provisions concerning the Education Property Tax Relief Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL CD-PROPERTY TAX RELIEF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-04-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.1015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4866&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4866.htm |