IL HB4882 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Provides that prior to a lease being signed, the lessor shall furnish to the lessee a room-by-room checklist to evaluate the condition of the dwelling unit prior to the lessee taking possession of the dwelling unit. Provides that the lessee shall complete the checklist, detailing any damage to the dwelling unit. Provides that prior to a lessee vacating possession of a dwelling unit, the lessor shall furnish to the lessee a room-by-room checklist to evaluate the condition of the dwelling unit at the time the lessee vacates the dwelling unit. Provides that the lessee shall complete the checklist, detailing any unrepaired damage to the dwelling unit incurred during the time it was in the possession of the lessee, and return the completed checklist to the lessor upon the return of any keys for the dwelling unit. Makes a corresponding change in the Security Deposit Return Act.
Title
LANDLORD/TENANT-CHECKLIST
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 705 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 710 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4882&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4882.htm |