IL HB4884 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that if guardianship is necessary and the petition for guardianship is filed by a person, corporation, nonprofit organization, or other entity with no legally recognized relationship to the alleged person with a disability, the court shall appoint the county public guardian as temporary and permanent guardian.
Title
GUARDIAN-ADULT W/ DISABILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11a-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |