IL HB4894 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mobile Home Park Act, the Illinois Plumbing License Law, the Private Sewage Disposal Licensing Act, the Nursing Home Care Act, the MC/DD Act, the ID/DD Community Care Act, the Commercial and Public Building Asbestos Abatement Act, the Lead Poisoning Prevention Act, the Structural Pest Control Act, the Swimming Facility Act, the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act, and the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that the procedures governing hearings authorized under the Acts shall be in accordance with rules adopted by the Department of Public Health. Requires a full and complete record to be kept of all contested proceedings by the Department. Removes language requiring the Department, at its expense, to provide a stenographer to take the testimony, or otherwise record the testimony, and preserve a record of proceedings. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
IDPH-ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 115 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 125 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 46 | 3-711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 3-711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 5 | 10g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 207 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 225 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 235 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 320 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 45 | 12.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4894&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4894.htm |