IL HB4945 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Blighted Areas Redevelopment Act of 1947. Effective immediately.
Title
BLIGHTED AREAS ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-01-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-01-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
315 | 5 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |