IL HB4954 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 044-059-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 044-059-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that records of charges that result in an acquittal or dismissal with prejudice, except for minor traffic offenses, may be immediately sealed after the final disposition of the case. Upon entry of judgment, the defendant shall be informed of this right and the proper procedures to follow to have records that are eligible be immediately sealed. A petition may be filed on behalf of the defendant by his or her attorney at the final disposition hearing, or by the defendant at any time. The State's Attorney may not object to an immediate sealing petition, and the presiding trial judge shall enter an order granting or denying the petition during the hearing in which the petition is filed. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM ID-IMMEDIATE SEALING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 44 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 044-059-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-001-000 |
2016-04-11 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2016-04-11 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-04-11 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2016-04-11 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-07 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-06 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-05 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-05 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-003-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |