IL HB4962 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that if a county board determines members shall be elected by districts, then each district shall be "substantially" equal in population to each other district. Provides that in counties of less than 500,000 inhabitants, the recorder may cause to be microphotographed or otherwise reproduced on electronic method of storage any instrument received in writing by the recorder. Further provides that authorization by the county board is not required for the reproduction of the instruments on film or electronic method of storage. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning County Clerks in counties of the first and second class. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-CLERKS & RECORDERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0986 |
2012-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Held in Local Government |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 2-3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-5010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-4001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |