IL HB4962 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that any public agency may invest any public funds, in addition to other investments, in pooled life settlement policies in which each of the underlying insurance policies have no greater than 60-day liquidity and are issued by insurance companies of A-grade investment quality. Provides further requirements concerning the investment of public funds in specified pooled life settlement policies.
Title
PUBLIC FUNDS-AUTH INVESTMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 235 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4962&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4962.htm |