IL HB4975 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that any licensee disciplined under a licensure Act administered by the Division of Professional Regulation for an offense relating to the failure to pay taxes, child support, or student loans or relating to continuing education or advertising may file a petition with the Department on forms provided by the Department, along with the required fee of $200, to have the records of that offense removed from public view on the Department's website if certain conditions are met. Provides that nothing shall prohibit the Department from using a previous discipline for any regulatory purpose or from releasing records of a previous discipline upon request from law enforcement, other governmental body, or the public. Provides that removal of records of a disciplinary offense from the Department's website shall not be considered a vacating or expunging of the offense from the licensee's disciplinary record. Effective immediately.
Title
DFPR-REMOVE PUBLIC RECORD
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] | Rep. Maria Berrios [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-001 | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-17 | First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2010-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-041-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading | |
2010-01-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |