IL HB4975 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Authorizes a mayor who deems that mob action is likely to occur at an event hosted by the municipality to: (i) enter into agreements with the necessary law enforcement agencies to deputize law enforcement personnel; (ii) change the fines for resisting a police officer or aiding escape; (iii) amend the hours that public parks, playgrounds, and other public spaces are open; and (iv) execute limited agreements with public and private entities for goods or services for security and logistics. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-MAYOR-MOB ACTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4975&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4975.htm |