IL HB4987 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall maintain a minimum number of Illinois State Police officers to ensure the safety of the force of Illinois State Police officers and the safety of the State. Provides that in no case shall that minimum number of Illinois State Police officers be less than 2,500 active Illinois State Police officers. Provides that if the total number of Illinois State Police officers in active service is less than 2,500, the Illinois State Police shall make every effort to retain more Illinois State Police officers and it is authorized to take every legal, reasonable step, including increasing training and recruitment efforts, in order to reach a minimum of 2,500 active Illinois State Police officers as soon as is practicable. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE POLICE-NUMBER-ST POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4987&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4987.htm |