IL HB4997 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a prescriber who is licensed to prescribe controlled substances shall, prior to issuing a prescription for an opioid that is a Schedule II controlled substance, discuss with a patient who is under 18 years of age and is an emancipated minor, or with the patient's parent or guardian if the patient is under 18 years of age and is not an emancipated minor, the risks of developing a physical or psychological dependence on the opioid and, if the prescriber deems it appropriate, any alternative treatments as may be available. Provides that a prescriber who engages in a discussion required under this provision shall include a note in the patient's medical record indicating that the discussion took place. Provides that the discussion required under this provision shall not be required prior to issuing a prescription to any patient who is currently receiving hospice care from a comprehensive hospice licensed under the Hospice Program Licensing Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-OPIOID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4997&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4997.htm |