IL HB5007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Changes definitions of "population" to be the total number of inhabitants according to the last preceding federal decennial census (rather than number of inhabitants or number of persons). Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Adds a definition of "population" in the general definition Section.
Title
MUNI CD & COUNTY CD-POPULATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2020-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 2-3001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5007&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5007.htm |