IL HB5016 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that persons licensed to possess a concealed firearm under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act and current or retired police officers authorized by law to possess a concealed firearm shall be exempt from provisions of the Code prohibiting possession of those firearms.
Title
WILDLIFE-CONCEALED CARRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-02-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Adam Brown |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5016&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5016.htm |