IL HB5019 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that Illinois State Police officers, including the Director of the Illinois State Police, deputy Directors, and Illinois State Police officers on administrative duties, shall receive at least 2 hours every month in de-escalation skills training. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that law enforcement officers, including chiefs of police and law enforcement officers on administrative duties, shall receive at least 2 hours every month in de-escalation skills training. Repeals provisions 10 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LAW ENFORCEMENT-DE-ESCALATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 705 | 10.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5019&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5019.htm |