IL HB5124 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Pembroke Township Natural Gas Investment Pilot Program Act. Directs the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to create a pilot program for the distribution of grants for the construction of new natural gas pipelines and infrastructure in Pembroke Township. Requires applicants for grants to demonstrate that the grants will result in the construction of a new natural gas pipeline to provide natural gas to the residents of the township. Provides that grantees are subject to audit by the State. Provides that the Department may accept private and public funds in furtherance of the purposes of the Pilot Program. Imposes data collection and reporting requirements. Provides that the Department shall report annually to the Governor and General Assembly beginning in 2022 regarding cost estimates for the Pilot Program, recommendations for improvement to the Pilot Program, and a recommendation as to whether the Pilot Program should be continued. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Pembroke Township Natural Gas Investment Pilot Program Fund.
Title
PEMBROKE TWP NATURAL GAS PILOT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |