IL HB5126 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that the association shall provide each member with the opportunity to specify whether the association may disclose the name, address, email address, or telephone numbers of the member to other association members. Provides that if a member indicates that he or she does not want the information disclosed to other members of the association, the information shall not be disclosed. Provides that the association shall impose a fine upon any person who discloses the information in violation of the expressed wishes of the member. Makes a corresponding change in a Section concerning the contents of bylaws.
Title
CONDO ACT-MEMBER PERSONAL INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5126&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5126.htm |