IL HB5221 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Family and Personal Protection Act. Permits the Department of State Police to issue permits to carry concealed firearms to persons at least 21 years of age who meet certain requirements. Provides that the county sheriff shall evaluate the application and accompanying material, and within 30 calendar days transmit the application, accompanying material, and any objections to the application, and application fees to the Department of State Police. Requires an applicant for a permit to have completed specified training requirements developed by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board consisting of classroom instruction and live firing exercises. Preempts home rule. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act and the Criminal Code of 1961 to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-PERMITS
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Jerry Mitchell [R] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2010-03-10 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-09 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |