IL HB5242 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0942
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0942
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that no later then January 1, 2011, the Inspector General of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall contract with an independent certified public accountant to perform a forensic audit of the medical assistance program under Article V of the Code as well as additional programs which receive funds through common budgetary lines appropriated to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services for comprehensive medical assistance operated under the Children's Health Insurance Program Act and the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act. Provides that the forensic audit shall include, but not be limited to, a review of the application and enrollment of individuals for services and reimbursements to providers for medical assistance, and that the audit shall focus on any fraud or inefficiencies which may be eliminated to contain costs and improve the delivery of care to eligible individuals. Requires the Director of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to report the findings of the audit to the General Assembly along with recommendations to address any adverse findings contained in the audit. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-FORENSIC AUDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0942 | |
2010-06-25 | Effective Date June 25, 2010 | |
2010-06-25 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-05 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2010-05-05 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2010-05-05 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-05-05 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2010-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2010-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2010-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2010-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |