IL HB5282 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Changes the effective date to January 1, 2026 (instead of January 1, 2025).
Title
INS CD-MISCARRIAGE/STILLBIRTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0701 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2026 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-001 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |