IL HB5303 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0912
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0912
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board Division of the Counties Code. Limits provisions regarding disciplinary measures prescribed by the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board that may be taken by the sheriff to termination (rather than any disciplinary measures not exceeding 30 days). Provides that all disciplinary measures other than termination must be taken in accordance with any applicable collective bargaining agreement and provisions of the Code concerning removal, demotion, or suspension. Effective immediately.
Title
SHERIFF'S MERIT BD-DISCIPLINE
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0912 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 064-049-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-7011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |